Tribuilt Construction Group, LLC v. International Fidelity Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Tribuilt Construction Group, LLC
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv02052
Filed: April 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by International Fidelity Insurance Company. It is further order that this case be Administratively Terminated without prejudice, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 26, 2013. (lw)
June 14, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT AND ORDER as set forth. Further any remaining claims against Joseph and Stacy Marrone are STAYED PENDING BANKRUPTCY. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on June 14, 2011. (lw)
June 13, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND ORDER as set forth. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on June 13, 2011. (lw)
November 17, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Order Authorizing Defendant to File Amended Counterclaim and Amended Third Party Complaint. The amended pleading should be filed within (10) days from the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 17, 2010. (lw)
October 20, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER; re 37 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The said ORDER of 10/19/10, is herewith re-published, nunc pro tunc 10/19/10, as follows: ORDER granting 23 Motion for Partia l Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further the Court notes that defendant's counterclaims and third-party claims are still pending in this case and the Court's ruling herein does not resolve those claims. This case is set for a bench trial for 4/4/11. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 20, 2010. (lw)
October 19, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further the Court notes that defendant's counterclaims and third-party claims are still pending in this case and the Court's ruling herein does not resolve those claims. This case is set for a bench trial for 4/5/11. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 19, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tribuilt Construction Group, LLC v. International Fidelity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tribuilt Construction Group, LLC
Represented By: Carey Brian Meadors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack East, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?