Philpott v. Weaver et al

Plaintiff: Robert S. Philpott
Defendant: Lt. Weaver, Brent Grill, Dickerson, Eversole, Van Buren Police Department, Riggs and John 1-3, Does
Case Number: 2:2010cv02061
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and denying plaintiff's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; further granting defendants' 26 Motion for Summary Judgment and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to any federal claims. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 21, 2012. (rw)
May 24, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the court declines to adopt the report and recommendation, re 33 . The U.S. Clerk is directed to re-mail the Notice Regarding Response to Motion, (doc. 29), and the Plaintiff is advised he must return the notice by June 10, 2011. Should Plaintiff fail to timely return the notice, his case will be subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey the order of this Court and failure to prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 24, 2011. (sh)
October 19, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Order of Service; and DIRECTING SERVICE on Chief Kenneth Bell, Detective Dickerson, Detective Eversole, Lt. Brent Grill, Officer Riggs, Lt. Weaver and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 19, 2010. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(lw)
September 21, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that plaintiff, Robert Scott Philpott, complete and sign the attached addendum to his complaint, and return the same to the court by 10/13/10. Plaintiff is advised that should he failure to return the completed and executed addendum by 10/13/10, his complaint may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to obey an order of the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 21, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpott v. Weaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Philpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-3, Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?