Piaquadio v. American Legal Funding, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adam Piaquadio
Defendant: American Legal Funding, LLC, Alfund AZ1, LLC, M.B.T. Associate, Inc, Law Funder, LLC, The and Global Financial Credit, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv02066
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Bond. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on May 1, 2012. (lw)
March 27, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 27, 2012. (lw)
June 30, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Adam Piaquadio against Alfund AZ1, LLC, American Legal Funding, LLC in the amount of $452,940.00 and interest at the rate of 0.17% per annum until paid. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 30, 2011. (lw)
January 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 14, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piaquadio v. American Legal Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Piaquadio
Represented By: Matt L. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Legal Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfund AZ1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B.T. Associate, Inc
Represented By: Randall I. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Funder, LLC, The
Represented By: Randall I. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Financial Credit, LLC
Represented By: Randall I. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?