Broussard et al v. Waldron School District et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Broussard and John Doe
Defendant: Waldron School District, James Floyd, Alice McConnell, Gary Clepper, David Maxwell and Joel Campora
Case Number: 2:2010cv02106
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed with prejudice, and the parties are instructed to bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 5, 2012. (lw)
September 4, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 4, 2012. (lw)
January 20, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directs the plaintiff John Doe, through his guardian and counsel, to provide the court with the details of his incapacity-to-include the date or onset-and a basis for appointment of a guardian to handle his affairs, and this information is to b e provided on or before February 1, 2012. Plaintiff is hereby advised that if plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order, defendants motion to dismiss will be granted. The defendants motion to dismiss will be will hold in obeyance until the court has ruled on the motion for extension of time to comply with this order re 21 . Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 20, 2012. (sh)
November 23, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss Case as to separate Defendant Joel Campora, That Plaintiff Teresa Broussard's claims against all Defendants are dismissed in their entirety and Plain tiff Teresa Boussard is dismissed as a party to this case. Further ordered that John Doe must proceed with this case using his legal name. Plaintiff John Doe is ORDERED to file on or before 12/14/11 an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Order as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 23, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard et al v. Waldron School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Broussard
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldron School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Clepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?