Price v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ariana Price
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association, USAA General Indemnity Co and USAA
Case Number: 2:2010cv02152
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to substitute the attached pages 11 and 12 for pages 11 and 12 of 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on July 13, 2012. (lw)
July 11, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting 73 Report and Recommendations and further denying 47 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 11, 2012. (lw)
February 22, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting in part 70 Report and Recommendations, as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 22, 2012. (lw)
October 25, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file briefs addressing questions raised in the telephonic hearing. Defendants shall have until 11/8/11 to file his brief and Plaintiff shall have until 11/22/11 to file his brief. In the event Defendants wish to file a reply brief, they should file a motion requesting such within five days of the filing of Plaintiffs brief. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 25, 2011. (lw)
June 17, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to Compel;and granting 41 Motion to Compel as set forth. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on June 17, 2011. (lw)
March 22, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Withdraw Motion and denying as moot 7 the Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable James Marschewski on March 22, 2011. (sh) Modified on 3/22/2011 to add text. (sh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Price
Represented By: Bennett Scott Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Co
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?