Fields v. Webb et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Fields
Defendant: Carol Webb, Rusty Webb, Michael Endekas and Aleshia Webb
Case Number: 2:2011cv02186
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in its entirety and denying 9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 24, 2012. (lw)
December 5, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as the claims are frivolous and/or fail to state claims upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is advised that this dismissal is considered a "strike" for purposes of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 5, 2011. (mfr)
October 4, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER finding that the interest of justice will best be served by transferring this case, this action is therefore immediately transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Fort Smith Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/4/11. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 10/5/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Webb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Endekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleshia Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?