Strouss v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Mattie S. Strouss
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2011cv02233
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees, in the amount of $3600.20. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff and not counsel. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 14, 2013. (sh)
November 26, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the 15 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on November 26, 2012. (sh)
December 20, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner, 5 . The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defend ant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 20, 2011. (sh)
December 6, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk return the IFP application to counsel with directions to provide more specific information as requested in this order, and an amended IFP application should be returned on or before December 20, 2011. Should Plaintiff fail t o comply within the required period of time, her complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order, re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Mattie S. Strouss. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 6, 2011. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strouss v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie S. Strouss
Represented By: Fred L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?