Davis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Rebecca J. Davis
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2012cv02003
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER awarding Attorney Fees in the amount $3,729.60, pursuant to EAJA 28 USC 2412. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 10, 2013. (sh)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the 16 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 24, 2013. (lw)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/18/2012.). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 21, 2012. (sh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca J. Davis
Represented By: Fred L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?