Marsh v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Sheryl Marsh
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2012cv02033
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 motion for attorney fees in the amount of $3975.85. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff and not counsel and Report and Recommendations re 23 are adopted in toto. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 21, 2013. (sh)
January 16, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended Motion for Attorney Fees contaning an itemized statement showing the actual time expended for each event on or before January 30, 2013. Defendant shall have (14) days to file a reply response to Plaintiff's amended motion for attorney fees, re 15 . Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 16, 2013. (sh)
December 5, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge as set forth in the 13 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 5, 2012. (rw)
February 16, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting 2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on th e defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2012. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Marsh
Represented By: Kevin Richmond Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?