McCollum v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jim W. McCollum
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02034
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT; as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 11, 2013. (lw)
March 20, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 28 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jim W. McCollum. Refer to order for requirements by the court. A motion hearing will be set under separate order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 20, 2013. (jas)
February 13, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding damages. Judgment to be entered at a later date. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 13, 2013. (jas)
February 7, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion in Limine, and denying 18 Motion to Exclude Expert. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on February 7, 2013. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollum v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim W. McCollum
Represented By: H Ray Hodnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?