Hyatt v. Hobbs, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction

Petitioner: Robert R Hyatt
Respondent: Ray Hobbs, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 2:2012cv02081
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full and denying petitioner's 16 Motion for Relief.. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 28, 2014. (rw)
July 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 13, 2012. (lw)
June 28, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and the instant Petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 28, 2012. (rw)
April 13, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 2 Application to Proceed IFP, and directing the petition to be filed nunc pro tunc as of March 19, 2012. The matter of service will be determined at a later date. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 13, 2012. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. Hobbs, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert R Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ray Hobbs, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?