Gilbreath et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Gilbreath and Glen Gilbreath
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv02142
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion 58 and Plaintiffs' cause of action is hereby Dismissed with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Clerk is directed to unconsolidate the cases, all pleadings and other documents in Trusty, et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc are to be filed under case no. 2:13cv2039. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 21, 2014. (lw) Modified on 1/21/2014 to edit text (lw).
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER; that the Gilbreaths pay Sunbeam $1,628.00 in attorney's fees incurred in making 22 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 14, 2013. (lw)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are to respond to Defendant's discovery requests by 5:00 p.m. on August 7, 2013. Defendant is directed to file an affidavit in regard to fees and expenses by July 31, 2013. Refer to the order for further court requirements. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 24, 2013. 22 Motion to Appoint Receiver TERMINATED - filed in error. (jas)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on April 18, 2013. (lw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbreath et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Gilbreath
Represented By: Buckley W Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Gilbreath
Represented By: Buckley W Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn A. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?