Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC et al v. Dauernheim

Plaintiff: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, NHS Management, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc. and Senior Care Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant: Debra Dauernheim
Case Number: 2:2012cv02284
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: P. K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth ; further denying as moot 42 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 43 Motio n in Limine; denying as moot 47 Motion disallow testimony and plaintiffs' complaint to compel arbitration is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 21, 2014. (rw) Modified on 1/21/2014 edit text(rw).
August 9, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Compel, as set forth. Further, this case remains set for trial on 1/27/14. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 9, 2013. (lw)
May 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 16, 2013. (sh) Modified on 5/16/2013 to add text (rw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC et al v. Dauernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHS Management, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northport Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senior Care Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Dauernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?