Willsey v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Charles Willsey
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02320
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company against Plaintiff Charles Willsey. Case is dismissed with prejudice, all parties are to bear their respective costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 17, 2013. (sh)
December 2, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Further, denying 84 Motion to Take Deposition. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 2, 2013. (lw)
November 19, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; striking 81 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 88 Motion to Strike, finding as moot 88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 88 Motion to Seal Document ; denying as moot and granting 91 Motion, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 19, 2013. (sh)
September 12, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER as set forth granting 52 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 12, 2013. (sh) Modified on 9/12/2013 to add text(rw).
August 26, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 40 Report and Recommendations, and granting 30 in part, Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Barring Testimony of Sutterfield, Bran, Slaight and Lonon AND denying in part 30 as to Sutterfield and Bean. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 26, 2013. (sh)
August 16, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and denying 18 Motion to Certify. This matter remains set for a jury trial during the week of 11/4/2013. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 16, 2013. (sh)
June 20, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 26 First MOTION to Compel. The parties are hereby directed to confer in an attempt to settle the above discover dispute. The parties are directed to contact Ms. Debbie Maddox within 10 days for the purpose of setting a hearing to resolve the discovery dispute. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 20, 2013. (sh)
June 3, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER as set forth 23 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 3, 2013. (sh) Modified to add text on 6/3/2013 (sh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willsey v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Randolph Charles Jackson
Represented By: Michael T. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Willsey
Represented By: Lucas Simon Gramlich
Represented By: Sterling T. Chaney
Represented By: Nathan Price Chaney
Represented By: Don P. Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?