Howard-Johnson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Carrie Howard-Johnson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2018cv02181
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
2 Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Carrie Howard-Johnson Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Attorney General (Duty, Davis)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Carrie Howard-Johnson Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to General Counsel (Duty, Davis)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Carrie Howard-Johnson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Duty, Davis)
November 5, 2018 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 31, 2018. (cla)
October 30, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes, III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (lw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Carrie Howard-Johnson. (Duty, Davis)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Carrie Howard-Johnson. (mjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Carrie Howard-Johnson. (mjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Carrie Howard-Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Unfavorable Decision 4.25.18, #2 Exhibit 2: AC Denial 8.31.18)(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard-Johnson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Howard-Johnson
Represented By: Davis Duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?