United States of America v. 24 Cases (sixteen, 18.7 oz. boxes per case) more or less, of raisin bran cereal et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 3 Pallets, more or less of 72 piece/cases of clairol hair coloring, 3 Cases more or less of cold cream deep cleansing make-up remover, 181 Cases of 6, 8 oz bottles of renewal hand sanitizer, 3 boxes of sterile signature care hydrogen peroxide cleansing disinfecting solution 12 fl oz, 13 Cases of (12 each boxes) neutrogena baby faces sunscreen spf 45 2.5 fl oz, 92 boxes, 20 Super 9-12 grams, packs per case, more or less of tampons biodegradable, all articles of human & animal food in any size & type of container (excluding metal & glass containers), & any & all drugs, cosmetics, & devices located anywhere on the property at J and L Grocery and 24 Cases (sixteen, 18.7 oz. boxes per case) more or less, of raisin bran cereal
Claimant: J and L Grocery, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02188
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 2, 2019. (jas)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Relief. This matter is exempt from initial disclosures and no Rule 26(f) report need be filed. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 27, 2018. (rab)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Relief from Rule 26(f) Requirements by United States of America. (Groom, Deborah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF PUBLICATION as to #1 Complaint of Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Fofeiture, #2 Exhibit B - Advertisement Certification Report)(Groom, Deborah)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/28/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 19, 2018. (jas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint of Forfeiture by J and L Grocery, LLC with Jury Demand.(Person, J. Dalton) Modified on 11/19/2018 to add Jury Deamnd (hnc).
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. J and L Grocery, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Signature Card)(Groom, Deborah)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to James White and Lori Layne. (hnc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 CLAIM by J and L Grocery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Articles, #2 Exhibit Verification)(Person, J. Dalton)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST/Notice in Rem as to All Defendants issued and delivered to US Marshal for service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford, November 7, 2018. (lw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America. (lw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE IN REM against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 24 Cases (sixteen, 18.7 oz. boxes per case) more or less, of raisin bran cereal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Pallets, more or less of 72 piece/cases of clairol hair coloring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Cases more or less of cold cream deep cleansing make-up remover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 181 Cases of 6, 8 oz bottles of renewal hand sanitizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 boxes of sterile signature care hydrogen peroxide cleansing disinfecting solution 12 fl oz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13 Cases of (12 each boxes) neutrogena baby faces sunscreen spf 45 2.5 fl oz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 92 boxes, 20 Super 9-12 grams, packs per case, more or less of tampons biodegradable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: all articles of human & animal food in any size & type of container (excluding metal & glass containers), & any & all drugs, cosmetics, & devices located anywhere on the property at J and L Grocery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 24 Cases (sixteen, 18.7 oz. boxes per case) more or less, of raisin bran cereal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Deborah Fennell Groom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: J and L Grocery, LLC
Represented By: J. Dalton Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?