Baggett v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Case Number: 2:2018cv02190
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating discovery deadline. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 7, 2018. (jas)
November 7, 2018 24 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2018. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd floor (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on November 7, 2018. (jas)
November 7, 2018 23 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw) (Main Document 23 replaced on 11/7/2018) (mjm).
November 7, 2018 22 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00739. Docket sheet received.
November 7, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Motion to Transfer; and directing the Clerk of the Court to immediately transfer this case to the Western District of Arkansas, Fort Smith Division. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/7/2018. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
November 5, 2018 20 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #18 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Accordingly, Defendant's response to the Motion to Remand must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/05/18. (dmm) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
November 5, 2018 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Samuel Baggett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Whitaker v. Shelter - Docket Sheet)(Bozeman, Marcus) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
November 5, 2018 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Greenwood, Sarah) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 26, 2018 17 Deficiency Letter notifying party that #16 Memorandum lacks a correct case number - Local Rule 5.5(a). (kbc) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 25, 2018 16 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities re #15 Remand to State Court filed by Samuel Baggett. (Bozeman, Marcus) Additional attachment added on 10/26/2018: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 25, 2018 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Samuel Baggett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Couch on Insurance 169:6, #2 Exhibit Pul. Cty. Cir. Ct. SJ Order, #3 Exhibit Logan Cty. Cir. Ct. SJ Order)(Bozeman, Marcus) Additional attachment added on 10/26/2018: #4 Main Document - Correct. (kbc) . Modified on 10/26/2018 (kbc). [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 18, 2018 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Transfer Case filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Greenwood, Sarah) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 18, 2018 13 MOTION to Transfer Case by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Greenwood, Sarah) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Docket Note: Pursuant to 12 Order, this case was transferred to the Western Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned case number 4:18-cv-00739-BRW. (jak) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 4, 2018 12 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Transfer Case (Change of Venue). The Clerk is directed to change the case to the Western Division. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/4/18. (mmb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
October 1, 2018 11 MOTION to Transfer Case by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Greenwood, Sarah) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 26, 2018 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Greenwood, Sarah) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 26, 2018 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Greenwood, Sarah) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 26, 2018 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/4/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/18/2018. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Helena Courtroom # 314 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 9/26/18. (mmb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 10 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER dismissing Separate Defendant Shelter General Insurance Company. Signed by Circuit Court Judge Timothy Davis Fox on 5/23/2018. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 5 AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company filed by Samuel Baggett. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 4 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Samuel Baggett. (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]
September 25, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company from Pulaski County Circuit Court, Case Number 60CV-18-1542. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT068926. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) [Transferred from ared on 11/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baggett v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?