Corea v. Whitaker et al
Plaintiff: Nelson Corea
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Matthew G. Whitaker and Field Office Dir. Christina Olguin
Case Number: 2:2019cv02024
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons / Complaint, filed by Nelson Corea. Lee Francis Cissna served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Receipt, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Swindle, Ken)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons / Complaint, filed by Nelson Corea. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 2/25/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Receipt, #2 Summons, #3 USPS Tracking)(Swindle, Ken) Modified on 3/15/2019 to edit answer due date (lw).
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons / Complaint, filed by Nelson Corea. Matthew G. Whitaker served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Green Card, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Swindle, Ken)
February 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Christina Olguin answer due 4/23/2019, defendant is a US Government Employee and given 60 days to answer. (lw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson Corea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Swindle, Ken)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nelson Corea. Christina Olguin served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Green Card, #3 Exhibit USPS Log, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Swindle, Ken)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Matthew G. Whitaker and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Matthew G. Whitaker, United States Acting Attorney General for service of the following document: #1 Complaint,,. (Swindle, Ken)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lee Francis Cissna and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kirstjen Nielsen and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Lee Francis Cissna, Director of the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services for service of the following document: #1 Complaint,,. (Swindle, Ken)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Kirstjen Nielsen, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security for service of the following document: #1 Complaint,,. (Swindle, Ken)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Christina Olguin and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (hnc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Nelson Corea. (hnc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: #1 List of Defendants) (hnc).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Christina Olguin, Matthew G. Whitaker, filed by Nelson Corea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: January 20, 2018 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2: February 20, 2018 Letter, #3 Exhibit February 21, 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4: February 22, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5: February 24, 2018 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6: March 7, 2018 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7: August 2, 2018 Letter, #8 Exhibit 8: August 17, 2018 Letter, #9 Exhibit August 29, 2018 Letter, #10 Exhibit 10: March 15, 2018 Letter, #11 Exhibit 11: May 7, 2018 Letter, #12 Exhibit 12: August 9, 2018 Letter, #13 Exhibit 13: August 28, 2018 Letter, #14 Exhibit January 15, 2019 Letter)(hnc)
February 7, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint,,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/11/2019 (hnc)
February 7, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1863337.. (Swindle, Ken)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corea v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Christina Olguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Corea
Represented By: Ken David Swindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?