Stevens et al v. GEICO General Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Donny Stevens and Amanda Stevens, Donny Stevens and Amanda Stevens
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company and John Does, I-IX
Case Number: 2:2019cv02026
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 25, 2019. (jas)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Donny Stevens and Amanda Stevens. (Kannett, Keith)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/22/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd floor (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 13, 2019. (jas)
February 11, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1865899.. (Doty, Dustin)
February 11, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/13/2019 (hnc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Company. Originally filed in Sebastian County Circuit Court on 2/8/19. Modified on 2/12/2019 to add original court informatoin (mjm).
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Does, I-IX, GEICO General Insurance Company, filed by Donny Stevens, Amanda Stevens, Donny Stevens and Amanda Stevens. Originally filed in Sebastian County Circuit Court on 1/10/19 (hnc) Modified on 2/11/2019 to add original court information (hnc). Modified on 2/12/2019 to edit text (mjm).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by GEICO General Insurance Company. (hnc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, Arkansas, case number 66FCV-19-23., filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. GEICO General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Stevens and Amanda Stevens
Represented By: Keith Michael Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donny Stevens
Represented By: Keith Michael Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Stevens
Represented By: Keith Michael Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Dustin Doty
Represented By: Caley B. Vo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, I-IX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?