OK Foods, Inc. v. Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: OK Foods, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: AES Shady Point LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02031
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
0 Judge: P K Holmes
1 Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Third-Party Complaint, filed by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. AES Shady Point LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Freeman, Karen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick William Stark on behalf of Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Stark, Patrick)
March 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael LaVigne on behalf of Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (LaVigne, Christopher)
March 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dodrill on behalf of Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Dodrill, Christopher) (Main Document 22 replaced on 3/27/2019) (mjm).
March 25, 2019 Filing 21 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to AES Shady Point LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to AES Shady Point, LLC for service of the following document: #19 Third Party Complaint. (Freeman, Karen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against AES Shady Point LLC, filed by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Sales Agreement)(hnc)
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Christopher S. Dodrill is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 25, 2019. (jas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Christopher M. LaVigne is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 25, 2019. (jas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. P. William Stark is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 25, 2019. (jas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Christopher S. Dodrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1887231) by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit OH Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit WV Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Freeman, Karen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Christopher M. LaVigne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1887218) by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Freeman, Karen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney P. William Stark to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1887213) by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Freeman, Karen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/19/2019. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 13, 2019. (jas)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc..(Freeman, Karen)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen P Freeman on behalf of Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by OK Foods, Inc.. Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Brown, Dale)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (hnc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Brown, Dale)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OK Foods, Inc.. (Brown, Dale)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale W. Brown, II on behalf of OK Foods, Inc.. (Brown, Dale)
February 18, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1869576.. (Brown, Dale)
February 15, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff OK Foods, Inc.. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Dale W. Brown. (mjm)
February 15, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/19/2019. (mjm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by OK Foods, Inc.. (mjm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Continental Carbonic Products, Inc., filed by OK Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Dry Ice Agreement)(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OK Foods, Inc. v. Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OK Foods, Inc.
Represented By: James Raymond Carroll
Represented By: Dale W. Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Dodrill
Represented By: Christopher Michael LaVigne
Represented By: Patrick William Stark
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AES Shady Point LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?