Peterson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Nancy Peterson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv02042
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Nancy Peterson. (Hamby, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. The parties' briefs shall not contain a recitation of the procedural history, evidence, or standard of review. Plaintiffs brief shall be limited solely to the specific points for appeal and a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to those points (including transcript page citations for this evidence). Defendants brief shall address the issues raised in Plaintiffs brief and may include additional relevant issues, with a discussion of the pertinent evidence as related to these issues (including transcript page citations for this evidence). A reply brief may be filed within seven (7) days after the response brief is filed, and shall be limited to those issues raised in the response brief that were not previously addressed. All briefs must include citations to applicable case-law supporting the parties positions. No extension of time to file a brief will be granted for any motion filed less than ten days prior to the date the brief is due. Extensions will only be granted for good cause shown. The briefs should be no longer than ten (10) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on June 10, 2019. (caz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(McField, Adrial)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hamby on behalf of Nancy Peterson. (Hamby, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Peterson. Office of Regional Chief Counsel was served on 4/9/19. (hnc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Peterson. US Attorney General served on 4/9/19 by Nancy Peterson. (hnc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Peterson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (lw)
April 2, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Nancy Peterson. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (mjm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service. (mjm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The clerk is directed to prepare and issue summons for service of the complaint, this order and the summons on the defendant by the MARSHALS SERVICE. The defendant should be served via the Office of Regional Chief Counsel Region IV, SSA, 1302 Young Street, Room 430, Dallas, Texas 75202-5433;the US Attorney General via the U. S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas via the Office of the United States Attorney, Western District of Arkansas, 414 Parker Avenue, Fort Smith, Arkansas 72902. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on March 25, 2019. (cla)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Nancy Peterson. (mjm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Nancy Peterson. (mjm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Nancy Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action)(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Peterson
Represented By: Michael Hamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Represented By: Adrial B. McField
Represented By: Mark W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?