AES Shady Point, LLC v. Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AES Shady Point LLC
Defendant: OK Foods, Inc. and Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02063
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FOR CASE NO. 2:19-CV-2063-PKH by AES Shady Point LLC. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02031-PKH, 2:19-cv-02063-PKH(Hall, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. That the clerk is directed to consolidate this case with case no. 2:19cv2031. Further closing this case; terminating all motions with leave to refile and terminating all attorneys not admitted to practice before this court or registered CM/ECF users as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 30, 2019. (lw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY OK FOODS, INC. AND INCOPORATED BRIEF IN SUPPORT AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION filed by AES Shady Point LLC. (Hall, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Niki Cung/Niki T. Cung is withdrawn and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 23, 2019. (rab)
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION of Niki Cung to Withdraw as Attorney by OK Foods, Inc.. (Cung, Niki)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael L. Brooks is withdrawn and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 21, 2019. (rab)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION of Michael L. Brooks to Withdraw as Attorney by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (hnc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER/REPLY to #10 Counterclaim by AES Shady Point LLC.(Hall, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen P Freeman on behalf of Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James Raymond Carroll on behalf of OK Foods, Inc.. (Carroll, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale W. Brown, II on behalf of OK Foods, Inc.. (Brown, Dale)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott Hall on behalf of AES Shady Point LLC. (Hall, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:19-cv-00132. Docket sheet received.
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick granting #6 Defendant Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Case to District of Western District of Arkansas. (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by OK Foods, Inc. ;(Cung, Niki) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by OK Foods, Inc. Responses due by 5/24/2019(Cung, Niki) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent O.K. Foods, Inc., Corporate Parent Industrias Bachoco for OK Foods, Inc.) by OK Foods, Inc. (Cung, Niki) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Niki Cung on behalf of OK Foods, Inc. (Cung, Niki) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District ) by AES Shady Point, LLC ;(Petrich, R.) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R. Mark Petrich on behalf of AES Shady Point, LLC (Petrich, R.) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against AES Shady Point, LLC by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (With attachments) *** Part 2 of two part document. (See pleading #7 ) (dma, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (With attachments) *** Part 1 of two part document. (See pleading #10 ) (Brooks, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2019 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District (Western District of Arkansas, Fort Smith Division) by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 5/14/2019(Brooks, Michael) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 26, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 4/26/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1262551 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (Brooks, Michael) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (Brooks, Michael) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Patrick R. Wyrick of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-132-PRW. (tls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/1/2019 to edit text, NEF regenerated. (tls, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refilling (Filing Fee due by 5/3/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number 18-CJ-245 by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]
December 21, 2018 PETITION filed in State Court against Continental Carbonic Products, Inc., OK Foods, Inc. by AES Shady Point, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from oked on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AES Shady Point, LLC v. Continental Carbonic Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AES Shady Point LLC
Represented By: R. Mark Petrich
Represented By: Michael Scott Hall
Represented By: Douglas W. Sanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Dale W. Brown, II
Represented By: Niki Cung
Represented By: James Raymond Carroll
Represented By: Niki T. Cung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Carbonic Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Brooks
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?