Howard v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tuesday Howard and Tuesday Silva
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02064
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial RE-SET for 5/4/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 19, 2019. (jas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Continuance of Trial Date. An amended scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 19, 2019. (jas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Stuart)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 14, 2019. (jas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Miller, Stuart)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 20, 2019. (jas)
May 20, 2019 Notice of Removal fee received: $400.00, receipt number 2021467. (mjm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE of Removal as to #2 Notice of Removal by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Stuart) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2019) (mjm). Modified on 5/20/2019 to add text (mjm).
May 17, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/20/2019. (mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Tuesday Howard. (Originally filed on 4/13/19 in the Circuit Court of Crawford County, AR case #17CV-19-234)(mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Crawford County, Arkansas, case number 17CV-19-234., filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Pleadings)(mjm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuesday Howard
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuesday Silva
Represented By: Timothy Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?