Mondy et al v. Shelter General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimber Mondy and Ron Mondy
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02067
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 8, 2019. (jas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shelter General Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2019. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd floor (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 30, 2019. (jas)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Randolph Charles Jackson on behalf of Shelter General Insurance Company. (Jackson, Randolph)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Shelter General Insurance Company.(Person, J. Dalton)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shelter General Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 29, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1922414.. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shelter General Insurance Company, filed by Ron Mondy, Kimber Mondy. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Crawford County, Arkansas on 4/25/2019 in case 17CV-19-271) (mjm) Modified on 5/29/2019 to add state court information (mjm).
May 29, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/31/2019. (mjm)
May 29, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Shelter General Insurance Company. Notice of Removal #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Randolph C. Jackson. (mjm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Crawford County, Arkansas, case number 17CV-19-271., filed by Shelter General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings)(mjm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shelter General Insurance Company. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mondy et al v. Shelter General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimber Mondy
Represented By: Derick A. J. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Mondy
Represented By: Derick A. J. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: Randolph Charles Jackson
Represented By: J. Dalton Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?