Cheatwood et al v. Baptist Health et al
Plaintiff: Mark Cheatwood and Caryl Cheatwood
Defendant: Dr. Michelle Horan, Unknown Medical Doctors 1 through 10, Dr. Daniel Mwanza, Unknown Hospital Staff 1 through 10 and Baptist Health
Case Number: 2:2019cv02088
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Caryl Cheatwood, Mark Cheatwood. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Hunnicutt, Steve)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Daniel Mwanza.(Garrett, Walker)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 7, 2019. (jas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Michelle Horan.(Browning, Michelle)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Cheatwood, Caryl Cheatwood. Daniel Mwanza served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Hunnicutt, Steve)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Baptist Health.(Bone, Tyler)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Daniel Bone on behalf of Baptist Health. (Bone, Tyler)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Cheatwood, Caryl Cheatwood. Michelle Horan served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Hunnicutt, Steve)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Cheatwood, Caryl Cheatwood. Baptist Health served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hunnicutt, Steve)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Baptist Health, Michelle Horan, Daniel Mwanza and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Dr. Daniel Mwanza for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hunnicutt, Steve)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Dr. Michelle Horan for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hunnicutt, Steve)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Baptist Health fka Sparks Regional Medical Center for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hunnicutt, Steve)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (hnc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Baptist Health, Michelle Horan, Daniel Mwanza, Unknown Hospital Staff 1 through 10, Unknown Medical Doctors 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1943100), filed by Mark Cheatwood, Caryl Cheatwood.(Hunnicutt, Steve)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Caryl Cheatwood, Mark Cheatwood. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheatwood et al v. Baptist Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cheatwood
Represented By: Steve Hunnicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl Cheatwood
Represented By: Steve Hunnicutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michelle Horan
Represented By: Michelle L. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical Doctors 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Daniel Mwanza
Represented By: Walker Dale Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hospital Staff 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Represented By: Tyler Daniel Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?