Grant v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Grant
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Exide Technologies
Case Number: 2:2019cv02091
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John F. Wymer, III is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 28, 2019. (jas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney John F. Wymer, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1972686) by Exide Technologies. (Jones, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Exide Technologies.(Jones, Michael)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Default by Veronica Grant as to Exide Technologies . (Lacy, Brandon)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Exide Technologies. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Default)(lw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines: Stipulated Record due by September 30, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 15, 2019. (jas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Veronica Grant. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Veronica Grant. Exide Technologies served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Exide Technologies, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Exide Technologies for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS.***DISREGARD ATTORNEY TO REFILE COMPLETED SUMMONS*** Summons Requested as to Exide Technologies for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon) Modified on 7/18/2019 to add text(lw).
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. DISREGARD ATTORNEY TO REFILE COMPLETED SUMMONS Summons Requested as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon) Modified on 7/18/2019 to add text(lw).
July 18, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1948105.. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
July 16, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/18/2019 (lw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Veronica Grant. (lw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exide Technologies, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, filed by Veronica Grant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exide Technologies
Represented By: Michael R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Grant
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?