Drewry v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Brenda K. Drewry
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2019cv02092
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Mark E Ford
2 Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda K. Drewry. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Attorney General of the U.S.)(Harp, David)
August 2, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Honorable Mark E. Ford no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
July 18, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Mark E. Ford, as the referral judge. (hnc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #4 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 18, 2019. (cla)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Brenda K. Drewry. (Harp, David)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Brenda K. Drewry. (Harp, David)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Brenda K. Drewry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harp, David)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 consent/reassignment)(hnc)
July 18, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/22/2019 (hnc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Brenda K. Drewry. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drewry v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda K. Drewry
Represented By: David K. Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?