Hall v. Johnson Regional Medical Center
Plaintiff: Cindy Hall
Defendant: Johnson Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv02100
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/13/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 10, 2019. (jas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson Regional Medical Center.(Young, Regina)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina A. Young on behalf of Johnson Regional Medical Center. (Young, Regina)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Cindy Hall. Johnson Regional Medical Center served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Johnson Regional Medical Center and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Johnson Regional Medical Center for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Johnson Regional Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1958322), filed by Cindy Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge, #2 Exhibit Notice)(Kitchens, Lloyd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Cindy Hall. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Johnson Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Hall
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Regina A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?