Butler v. Arkansas Court of Appeals
Petitioner: Garland D. Butler
Respondent: Arkansas Court of Appeals
Case Number: 2:2019cv02138
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arkansas Court of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Argument Section of Appellant's Brief, #2 Exhibit 1B - Argument Section of Appellee's Brief, #3 Exhibit 2 - Arkansas Court of Appeals Opinion, Delivered November 13, 2019, #4 Exhibit 3 - Direct Appeal Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 4 - Arkansas Court of Appeals Record, CR-19-515, 2 Vols. 422 pages)(Yarbrough, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 11, 2019. (hnc)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 11, 2019. (hnc)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; the Respondents are given until 1/2/2020 to file their response. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 11, 2019. (hnc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Garland D. Butler. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Garland D. Butler. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arkansas Court of Appeals. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(Yarbrough, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Gaylon Lay received documents on 11/21/19. (hnc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Yarbrough, Jr on behalf of Arkansas Court of Appeals. (Yarbrough, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #3 Order Directing Service. Arkansas Court of Appeals-Leslie Rutledge served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (mjm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/19/2019) (mjm).
November 12, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Leslie Rutledge using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 6315. (lw)
November 12, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #3 Order Directing Service, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Gaylon Lay using Certified Mail Article number 7013 2630 0001 6868 6308. (lw)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO SERVE Arkansas Court of Appeals and the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas as set forth and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on November 12, 2019. (lw)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/12/2019) (hnc).
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Garland D. Butler.(lw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #1 Petition for Appeal Bond) (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Arkansas Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arkansas Court of Appeals
Represented By: Michael Yarbrough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garland D. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?