Turner v. Van Buren Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Candace-Renee Turner
Defendant: Chief Jamie Hammond, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Charles Green, City of Van Buren, Captain Halbert Torraca, Unknown Officers, Van Buren Police Department, Corporal David Passen and Crawford County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv02142
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. This case is STAYED and the Clerk is directed to administratively close the matter. Separate Defendant City of Van Buren is directed to move to reopen this matter following resolution of the state court case; #3 Motion to Dismiss is TERMINATED with leave to refile upon reopening of this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 7, 2020. (hnc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Candace-Renee Turner re #9 Answer to Complaint, #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Criminal Disposition. (hnc)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Charles Green, David Passen and returned to plaintiff for service. (hnc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Stay Pending Criminal Disposition by City of Van Buren, Charles Green, Jamie Hammond, David Passen, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Van Buren Police Department. (Adams, Jenna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Pending Criminal Disposition by City of Van Buren, Charles Green, Jamie Hammond, David Passen, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Van Buren Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Adams, Jenna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City of Van Buren, Charles Green, Jamie Hammond, David Passen, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Van Buren Police Department.(Adams, Jenna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of City of Van Buren, Charles Green, Jamie Hammond, David Passen, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Van Buren Police Department. (Adams, Jenna)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace-Renee Turner. Crawford County Detention Center served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019; Van Buren Municipal Complex served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Van Buren Police Department served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (mjm)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Candace-Renee Turner. (mjm)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Crawford County Detention Center, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Van Buren Police Department and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (mjm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Crawford County Detention Center, Halbert Torraca. (Newell, C.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Crawford County Detention Center, Halbert Torraca. (Newell, C.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Van Buren, Crawford County Detention Center, Charles Green, Jamie Hammond, David Passen, Halbert Torraca, Unknown Officers, Van Buren Municipal Complex, Van Buren Police Department (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 2021979), filed by Candace-Renee Turner.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Van Buren Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Jamie Hammond
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren Municipal Complex
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Green
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Van Buren
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Halbert Torraca
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren Police Department
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal David Passen
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford County Detention Center
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace-Renee Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?