Lee v. Southern Star, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Lee, Lester Nuckolls, Terry McSpadden, Robert King, Charles Landers and Corey Lomon
Defendant: Jeremy Fields and Southern Star, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02015
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration filed by Robert King, Charles Landers, Dustin Lee, Corey Lomon, Terry McSpadden, Lester Nuckolls. (Rheaume, April)
April 2, 2020 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave. Plaintiffs are directed to immediately file the sur-reply attached as an exhibit to the motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 2, 2020. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Robert King, Charles Landers, Dustin Lee, Corey Lomon, Terry McSpadden, Lester Nuckolls. Amended Complaint #27 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Nicholas Colon and Jason T. Brown. (lw)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER re #18 MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration. In light of the filing of the amended complaint, Defendants may file a supplement to the motion. Any supplement is due by April 16, 2020. Any response to the supplement is due within 7 days of the filing of a supplement. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 1, 2020. (rab)
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Robert King, Charles Landers, Dustin Lee, Corey Lomon, Terry McSpadden, Lester Nuckolls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rheaume, April)
March 31, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #3 Complaint against Southern Star, Inc., Jeremy Fields, filed by Robert King, Terry McSpadden, Dustin Lee, Charles Landers, Corey Lomon, Lester Nuckolls. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Dustin Lee.(mjm)
March 26, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration filed by Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Gallant Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - 2013 Arbitration Agreement)(Busey, Zachary)
March 26, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 Defendants' Motion for Leave to file a reply. Defendants are directed to immediately file the reply attached as an exhibit to the motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 26, 2020. (mer)
March 25, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration by Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply)(Busey, Zachary)
March 20, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Certify Collective Action for Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information ...to Temporarily Stay Briefing & Consideration of Sa filed by Dustin Lee. (Sanford, Josh)
March 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Certify Collective Action for Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information ...to Temporarily Stay Briefing & Consideration of Same, Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration by Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary)
March 18, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration filed by Dustin Lee. (Sanford, Josh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 CLASS ELECTION for Lester Nuckolls. (Rheaume, April)
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration by Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss & Compel Arbitration by Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - S. Gallant Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lee Executed Agreement)(Busey, Zachary)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M Bedsole on behalf of All Defendants. (Bedsole, Jenna)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #15 MOTION to Certify Collective Action for Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information by Dustin Lee. (Sanford, Josh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Certify Collective Action for Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information by Dustin Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Sanford, Josh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jenna M. Bedsole is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 4, 2020. (jas)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Jenna M. Bedsole to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of All Defendants (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2093151) by Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Busey, Zachary)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 CLASS ELECTION for Terry McSpadden. (Rheaume, April)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 CLASS ELECTION for Charles Landers. (Rheaume, April)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 CLASS ELECTION for Robert King. (Rheaume, April)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 CLASS ELECTION for Cory Lomon. (Rheaume, April)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 CLASS ELECTION for Dustin Lee. (Rheaume, April)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by April Rheaume on behalf of Dustin Lee. (Rheaume, April)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Southern Star, Inc., and Jeremy Fields for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Fields, Southern Star, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2079453), filed by Dustin Lee.(Sanford, Josh)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Dustin Lee. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Southern Star, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Fields
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Jenna M Bedsole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Star, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Jenna M Bedsole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Lee
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Nuckolls
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry McSpadden
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert King
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Landers
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Lomon
Represented By: April Rheaume
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?