Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC et al v. Ellis
Plaintiff: NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding, LLC, NHS Management, LLC and Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Defendant: Angie P. Ellis
Case Number: 2:2020cv02021
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 30 JUDGMENT that this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 10, 2020. (lw)
April 10, 2020 Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER; granting #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to its refiling in the forum agreed to by the parties. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Further Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Summary Judgment and #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claims are TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 10, 2020. (lw)
April 9, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Grounds of Issue Preclusion by Angie P. Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - State Court Order Finding Agreement Invalid, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Collective State Court Pleadings)(Swindle, Matthew)
April 9, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Grounds of Issue Preclusion by Angie P. Ellis. (Swindle, Matthew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Angie P. Ellis (Zachary, Heather)
March 13, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; and Statement of Facts Not in Dispute, filed by NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, NHS Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Correspondence)(Randall, Stephanie)
March 13, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Angie P. Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response Filed by Plaintiffs In State Court)(Swindle, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendant is directed to immediately file the reply attached as an exhibit to the motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 13, 2020. (mer)
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Angie P. Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss with exhibit)(Swindle, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 21 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/17/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/11/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 11, 2020. (jas)
March 9, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Email correspondence)(Randall, Stephanie)
March 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Reddick on behalf of Angie P. Ellis. (Reddick, Brian)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Wewers on behalf of Angie P. Ellis. (Wewers, Eric)
March 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Francis on behalf of Angie P. Ellis. (Francis, Robert)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Watts on behalf of Angie P. Ellis. (Watts, Wesley)
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Swindle on behalf of Angie P. Ellis. (Swindle, Matthew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Angie P. Ellis. (Zachary, Heather)
February 26, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Angie P. Ellis. (Zachary, Heather)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather G. Zachary on behalf of Angie P. Ellis. (Zachary, Heather)
February 25, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. Statement of Facts, #11 , Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 , Memorandum Brief in Support, #10 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Kirkman T. Dougherty. (lw)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. (Randall, Stephanie)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. (Randall, Stephanie)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Admission Agreement and Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- Durable Power of Attorney)(Randall, Stephanie)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Compel Arbitration, filed by NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, NHS Management, LLC. Angie P. Ellis served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Proof of Service)(Randall, Stephanie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Angie P. Ellis and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Angie P. Ellis, as Attorney-In-Fact of Karleen Vernon for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Randall, Stephanie)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Angie P. Ellis and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Angie P. Ellis, as Attorney-In-Fact of Karleen Vernon for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Randall, Stephanie)
February 20, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. Complaint, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Kirkman T. Dougherty. (hnc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2083694), filed by NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, NHS Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Circuit Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Admission Agreement and Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3- Power of Attorney)(Randall, Stephanie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by NHS Management, LLC, NHS Operations, LLC, Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, Northport Health Services, Inc., Northport Holding Operations, LLC, Northport Holding, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC et al v. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHS Operations, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northport Holding Operations, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northport Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northport Holding, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHS Management, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie I. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie P. Ellis
Represented By: Matthew David Swindle
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Robert William Francis
Represented By: Eric D. Wewers
Represented By: Wesley Watts
Represented By: Brian D. Reddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?