Holmes v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Steven Holmes
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02040
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S ORDER re #13 Stipulation of Dismissal. Separate Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (hnc) Modified text on 5/5/2020 (hnc).
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TYSON FOODS, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth. Stipulated Record is due by 6/12/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 28, 2020. (jas)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc., UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Steven Holmes. Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bryant, Glen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Steven Holmes. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bryant, Glen)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Donovan, David)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc., UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Bryant, Glen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to TYSON FOODS, INC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Bryant, Glen)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2112021), filed by Steven Holmes.(Bryant, Glen)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Steven Holmes. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Holmes
Represented By: Glen E. Bryant, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?