Adams v. United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Adams
Defendant: United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company and O.K. Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02041
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth: Stipulated Record is due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 20, 2020. (jas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Donovan, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing O.K. Foods, Inc. without prejudice. (lw)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT O.K. FOODS, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE by United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Donovan, David)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Carolyn Adams. United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bryant, Glen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Donovan, David)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Carolyn Adams. O.K. Foods, Inc. served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Bryant, Glen)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to O.K. Foods, Inc., United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to UNITED MUTUAL OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Complaint. (Bryant, Glen)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to O.K. FOODS, INC. for service of the following document: #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #2 Complaint. (Bryant, Glen)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2112016), filed by Carolyn Adams.(Bryant, Glen)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Carolyn Adams. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Adams
Represented By: Glen E. Bryant, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mutual of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.K. Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?