Cellco Partnership v. Alma Arkansas, The City of, et al.
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership and Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Defendant: Alma, Arkansas, The City of and The City of Alma Planning Commission
Case Number: 2:2020cv02050
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Bench Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 26, 2020. (jas)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cellco Partnership. (hnc)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership Rule 26(f) Report (Tom, Robert)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 3/22/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 24, 2020. (jas)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Alma, Arkansas, The City of, The City of Alma Planning Commission.(Brister, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cellco Partnership. The City of Alma Planning Commission served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Tom, Robert)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cellco Partnership. Alma, Arkansas, The City of served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Tom, Robert)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cellco Partnership. (Tom, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Alma, Arkansas, The City of, The City of Alma Planning Commission and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to City of Alma for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Tom, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BARWDC-2114721), filed by Cellco Partnership.(Tom, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Alma Planning Commission for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Tom, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Cellco Partnership. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellco Partnership v. Alma Arkansas, The City of, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma, Arkansas, The City of
Represented By: Michael Sean Brister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Alma Planning Commission
Represented By: Michael Sean Brister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?