Fingerhut v. EBSCO Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Fingerhut
Defendant: EBSCO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02062
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Russell Magnus on behalf of All Defendants. (Magnus, Eric)
May 18, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant EBSCO Industries, Inc.. Answer to Amended Complaint #7 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Eric R. Magnus. (mjm)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/24/2020. Bench Trial set for 3/22/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 18, 2020. (jas)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EBSCO Industries, Inc.. (Fray, Amanda)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by EBSCO Industries, Inc..(Fray, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #2 Complaint against EBSCO Industries, Inc. , filed by William Fingerhut. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by William Fingerhut.(Rheaume, April)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to EBSCO Industries, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to EBSCO Industries, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against EBSCO Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2125667), filed by William Fingerhut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join -- William Fingerhut)(Sanford, Josh)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by William Fingerhut. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fingerhut v. EBSCO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBSCO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Jayne Fray
Represented By: Eric Russell Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fingerhut
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: April Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?