Pepper Source Ltd v. CHEP et al
Plaintiff: Pepper Source Ltd and Pepper Source, LTD.
Defendant: Brambles USA, Inc., Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Services, LLC and CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02079
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by July 13, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 22, 2020. (rjs)
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 Memorandum Brief in Support, by Pepper Source, LTD.. (Chronister, Rex)
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Deitchler, Max)
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Deitchler, Max)
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part #16 Motion to Extend. The deadline to answer or respond is extended to June 15, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 2, 2020. (rab)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tarvin, Andrew)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #14 Motion to Extend. Absent other compelling circumstances, settlement negotiations alone are not good cause to extend deadlines. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 29, 2020. (rab)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Tarvin, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Vitale on behalf of Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Vitale, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Yameel L. Mercado Robles on behalf of Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Mercado Robles, Yameel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael S. Vitale is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 12, 2020. (jas)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Yameel L. Mercado Robles is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 12, 2020. (jas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Michael S. Vitale to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2139185) by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deitchler, Max)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Yameel L. Mercado Robles to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2139182) by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deitchler, Max)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Any response or answer to the complaint must be filed by June 4, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 11, 2020. (rab)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. (Tarvin, Andrew)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Max R. Deitchler on behalf of All Defendants. (Deitchler, Max)
May 11, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Brambles Americas, Inc., Brambles North America, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., CHEP Services, LLC. Notice of Removal, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Michael S Vitale and Yameel L. Mercado Robles. (hnc)
May 8, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2138060.. (Tarvin, Andrew)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pepper Source Ltd. (Filed in the Circuit Court of Crawford County, AR, 17cv-20-00156 3/16/2020)(lw)
May 8, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/11/2020 (lw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by All Defendants. (lw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Crawford County Circuit Court, AR, case number 17CV-20-156, filed by Brambles North America, Inc., CHEP, CHEP Services, LLC, CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc., Brambles USA, Inc. Brambles Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B All State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit C Corporate Disclosure)(lw) Modified on 5/8/2020 to edit text (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepper Source Ltd v. CHEP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brambles USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Michael S Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brambles Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Michael S Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brambles North America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Michael S Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEP
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Michael S Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEP Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Michael S Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEP Container and Pooling Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Yameel L. Mercado Robles
Represented By: Michael S Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pepper Source Ltd
Represented By: Rex W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pepper Source, LTD.
Represented By: Rex W. Chronister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?