Estes v. Bolin et al
Plaintiff: Shaun Jermaine Estes
Defendant: Keith Shelby, Kevin Bolin, Scott Newton and City of Fort Smith Police Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv02091
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss City of Fort Smith Police Department (a corporation); Further, denying #18 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's claims against the remaining Defendants remain pending at this time. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 14, 2020. (mjm)
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #15 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Shaun Jermaine Estes. (lw)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 2, 2020. (jas)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Party by City of Fort Smith Police Department. (Adams, Jenna)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Party by City of Fort Smith Police Department. (Adams, Jenna)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kevin Bolin, City of Fort Smith Police Department, Scott Newton, Keith Shelby.(Adams, Jenna)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of Kevin Bolin, City of Fort Smith Police Department, Scott Newton, Keith Shelby. (Adams, Jenna)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Scott Newton served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (mjm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Kevin Bolin served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; City of Fort Smith Police Department served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Keith Shelby served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (mjm)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kevin Bolin, City of Fort Smith Police Department, Scott Newton, Keith Shelby and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Complaint, #9 Order Directing Service,. (mjm)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Kevin Bolin, City of Fort Smith Police Department, Scott Newton, Keith Shelby and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 11, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(mjm)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit ; granting #7 Motion for Service. Service will be by separate order.. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 11, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(klk)
June 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Shaun Jermaine Estes. (hnc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With his complaint, Plaintiff submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application. However, the application is incomplete because it was not signed and dated. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either return the completed application to this court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 50.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 400.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 400.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on June 10, 2020. (klk)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
June 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Shaun Jermaine Estes. (hnc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Identity of the Parties by Shaun Jermaine Estes. (hnc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shaun Jermaine Estes. (hnc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kevin Bolin, City of Fort Smith Police Department, Scott Newton, Keith Shelby, filed by Shaun Jermaine Estes.(hnc) Modified on 6/5/2020 to add text (hnc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estes v. Bolin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fort Smith Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Jermaine Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?