Evans v. Kees
Petitioner: David Ray Evans
Respondent: Duane Kees and Dak
Case Number: 2:2020cv02097
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT that this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 3, 2020. (mjm)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING IN ITS ENTIRETY #4 Report and Recommendations; Further, denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by David Ray Evans is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 3, 2020. (mjm)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by David Ray Evans. Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on July 14, 2020. (lw)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Ray Evans. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(hnc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus against Duane Kees, filed by David Ray Evans.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Duane Kees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Ray Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?