Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC v. American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC
Defendant: American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc. doing business as DDS Dental Supplies
Case Number: 2:2020cv02128
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0277
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. (lw)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC . (Ryburn, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC. American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Ryburn, Jason)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC to #2 Complaint Plaintiff's Exhibit 1. (Ryburn, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anthony I. Paronich is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 28, 2020. (jas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Anthony I. Paronich to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2187584) by Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC. (Ryburn, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (hnc)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint. (Ryburn, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2187376), filed by Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC.(Ryburn, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC v. American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fianna Family Dentistry, PLC
Represented By: Jason Ryburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical & Dental Supplies, Inc. doing business as DDS Dental Supplies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?