Streetman v. Fort Smith, City of et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Sue Streetman
Defendant: Joseph Underwood, Fort Smith, City of, Giselle Elmore, Richard Proctor, Lauren Hendricks and Keith Shelby
Case Number: 2:2020cv02136
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER Directed to Plaintiff to Provide Information to Serve Defendant(s). It is the responsibility of the Plaintiff to provide the Court with an address for proper service on the Defendants. See Lee v. Armontrout, 991 F.2d 487, 489 (8th Cir. 1993). In her Complaint, Plaintiff failed to provide any service addresses for Defendants. Plaintiff is therefore ordered to provide the Court with addresses to use in serving each Defendant no later than 21 days from the entry of this order. If the Plaintiff fails to provide the additional information by the deadline, any Defendant without a service address will be dismissed as a party from this case. Information for Service due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 26, 2020. (klk)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 26, 2020. (klk)
August 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Melissa Sue Streetman. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(lw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Sue Streetman. (lw)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With her complaint, Plaintiff submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application. However, the application is incomplete because it was signed by someone other than the Plaintiff. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either return the completed application to this court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 50.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 400.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 400.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 7, 2020. (klk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
August 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Melissa Sue Streetman. Motions referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(mjm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Melissa Sue Streetman. (mjm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giselle Elmore, Fort Smith, City of, Lauren Hendricks, Richard Proctor, Keith Shelby, Joseph Underwood, filed by Melissa Sue Streetman.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streetman v. Fort Smith, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Smith, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giselle Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Sue Streetman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?