Simpson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Simpson, Sr.
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Hiland Dairy Foods Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02143
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth: Stipulated Record is due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 5, 2020. (jas)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Wahlheim, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Hiland Dairy Foods Company, L.L.C. without prejudice. (lw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Hiland Dairy Foods Company, LLC by Vernon Simpson, Sr. (Lacy, Brandon)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer is due by October 5, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 11, 2020. (mer)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hiland Dairy Foods Company, L.L.C.. (Wahlheim, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Vernon Simpson, Sr. Hiland Dairy Foods Company, L.L.C. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hiland Dairy Foods Company, L.L.C. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mjm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Hiland Dairy Company, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hiland Dairy Foods Company, LLC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AARWDC-2201761), filed by Vernon Simpson, Sr.(Lacy, Brandon) Modified on 8/17/2020 to edit text (mjm).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Vernon Simpson, Sr. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Simpson, Sr.
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiland Dairy Foods Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?