Wood v. Avient Corporation of Ohio
Plaintiff: Lee Wood
Defendant: Avient Corporation of Ohio doing business as Polyone Corporation doing business as Mesa Industries
Case Number: 2:2021cv02032
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Avient Corporation of Ohio (Hodges, Melissa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Avient Corporation of Ohio. (lw)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk to enter Defendant Avient Corporation of Ohio's default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). The parties may disregard the #12 notice of default procedure. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 1, 2021. (rab)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 ***DISREGARD, SEE TEXT ONLY ORDER 13*** NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Avient Corporation of Ohio. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Default)(lw) Modified on 3/3/2021 to add text (lw).
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The deadline to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to February 24, 2021. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 22, 2021. (mer)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Avient Corporation of Ohio. (Hodges, Melissa)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the winter weather affecting defense counsel's operations, the deadline to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to February 19, 2021. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 11, 2021. (rab)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Avient Corporation of Ohio. (Hodges, Melissa)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD - refiled correct motion, see document 8*** Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Avient Corporation of Ohio. (Hodges, Melissa) Modified on 2/11/2021 to disregard (mjm).
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Court does not extend deadlines for the sole purpose of allowing the parties to engage in settlement discussions. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 9, 2021. (mer)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Avient Corporation of Ohio. (Hodges, Melissa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
February 1, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/3/2021.(mjm)
February 1, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2324928.. (Hodges, Melissa)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Avient Corporation of Ohio, filed by Lee Wood. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Sebastian County on 12/22/2020 in case CV-20-773)(mjm)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sebastian County, case number 20-CV-773., filed by Avient Corporation of Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C: Verified Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D: Service of Process Transmittal, #5 Exhibit E: Redacted IRS W-2 Form, #6 Exhibit F: Certified State Court Record, #7 Exhibit G: Notice of Filing Removal)(mjm)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Avient Corporation of Ohio. (mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Avient Corporation of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avient Corporation of Ohio doing business as Polyone Corporation doing business as Mesa Industries
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Wood
Represented By: Bradley Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?