Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation v. BP Energy Company
Plaintiff: Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation
Defendant: BP Energy Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02073
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Trail, Zachary)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/23/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 17, 2021. (jas)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Energy Company. (Rankin, James)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by BP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rankin, James)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER extending deadline for Defendant BP Energy Company to answer or respond to the complaint to May 17, 2021. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 15, 2021. (rab)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond and Request for Order of the Clerk by BP Energy Company. (Rankin, James)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Weiler on behalf of Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Weiler, Steven)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Creighton Magid on behalf of Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Magid, Creighton)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. BP Energy Company served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Wilson, Kyle)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Creighton R. Magid is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 13, 2021. (jas)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Steven A. Weiler is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 13, 2021. (jas)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Creighton R. Magid to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2368130) by Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wilson, Kyle)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Steven A. Weiler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2368121) by Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wilson, Kyle)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to BP Energy Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to BP Energy Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Trail, Zachary)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/1/2021 (lw)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2359947.. (Norton, N.)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Trail on behalf of Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Trail, Zachary)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Ray Wilson on behalf of Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Wilson, Kyle)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BP Energy Company, filed by Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Base Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Transaction Confirmation)(Norton, N.)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (jlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation v. BP Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Oklahoma Gas Corporation
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Represented By: Zachary Trail
Represented By: N. M. Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Creighton Magid
Represented By: Steven Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Energy Company
Represented By: James D Rankin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?