Berry v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Karen Chitwood Berry
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02087
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 Letter Regarding remand sent to Crawford County Circuit Court. (src)
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 OPINION and ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand. The case is immediately remanded to Circuit Court of Crawford County, Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 28, 2021. (src)
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline to file the Response is JUNE 4, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 26, 2021. (slc)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Dalton Person on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Person, J. Dalton)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Remand by Karen Chitwood Berry re #2 Notice of Removal . (Horan, Matthew) Modified text and event on 5/14/2021 (src).
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/14/2021 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/18/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 6, 2021. (slc)
May 3, 2021 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT, per chambers. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable P. K. Holmes III no longer assigned to the case. (mjm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Jackson, Randolph)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Karen Chitwood Berry. (Originally filed in the Circuit Court of Crawford County on 03/29/2021 in case number 17CR-21-126)(mjm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Crawford County, case number 17CV-21-126., filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons)(mjm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (mjm)
April 30, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2381392.. (Jackson, Randolph)
April 30, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/3/2021.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Randolph Charles Jackson
Represented By: J. Dalton Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Chitwood Berry
Represented By: Stephen Campbell Smith
Represented By: Matthew Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?