FS Southbrooke LP v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: FS Southbrooke LP
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02120
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 23 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 9, 2021. (jas)
August 9, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Young, Regina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Patrick M. Kemp and Robert R. Russell are withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove their names from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 13, 2021. (jas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION of Patrick M. Kemp and Robert R. Russell to Withdraw as Attorney /Defendant Nationwide General Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Young, Regina)
July 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. Marts, Jr on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Marts, Gary)
July 6, 2021 Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2021. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 6, 2021. (jas)
July 6, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William D. Taylor appearing for Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 6, 2021. (jas)
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney William D. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice Without Local Counsel (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2420678) by FS Southbrooke LP. (Taylor, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina A. Young on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Young, Regina)
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00925. Docket sheet received.
June 29, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Case Transferred In - District Transfer #13 (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:William D. Taylor, Patrick M. Kemp, and Robert R. Russell. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (mjm)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Western District of Arkansas. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/28/2021) (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Kemp, Patrick) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to Western District of Arkansas filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order) (Kemp, Patrick) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/7/2021) (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D Taylor on behalf of FS Southbrooke LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Taylor, William) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Patrick M Kemp added to party Nationwide General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kemp, Patrick) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nationwide General Insurance Company; served on 5/6/2021. (Doyle, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nationwide General Insurance Company. (jmg) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by FS Southbrooke, LP. (Doyle, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FS Southbrooke, LP. (Doyle, Benjamin) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten on 4/23/2021) (jmg). [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Nationwide General Insurance Company filed by FS Southbrooke, LP. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11829215) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Doyle, Benjamin) [Transferred from txnd on 6/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FS Southbrooke LP v. Nationwide General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS Southbrooke LP
Represented By: Benjamin David Doyle
Represented By: William D Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M Kemp
Represented By: Robert R Russell
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Regina A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?