Sharrah v. Brown
Petitioner: Ricky Dean Sharrah
Respondent: Sheriff Ron Brown
Case Number: 2:2021cv02128
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Mark E Ford
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered, case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 20, 2021. (jlm)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Further, denying #4 Motion to transfer to protective custody. Judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 20, 2021. (jlm)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Ricky Dean Sharrah. (mjm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer to Protective Custody by Ricky Dean Sharrah. (mjm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ricky Dean Sharrah. Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on August 9, 2021. (mjm)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt number 2023593, Filing fee $ 5.00), filed by Ricky Dean Sharrah.(mjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharrah v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Dean Sharrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Ron Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?