Kirby v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Janetta Kirby
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02205
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America's answer is now due 2/23/2022.Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 12, 2022. (hfh)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss Party Tyson Foods, Inc. Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 12, 2022. (hfh)
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Decker, Byrne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Decker, Byrne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Tyson Foods, Inc. by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Decker, Byrne)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Janetta Kirby. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Lacy, Brandon)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Janetta Kirby. Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 12/27/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Tyson Foods, Inc., UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Tyson Foods, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Tyson Foods, Inc. and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2513944), filed by Janetta Kirby.(Lacy, Brandon) Modified on 12/20/2021 to edit text (lw).
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Janetta Kirby. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janetta Kirby
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Byrne Joseph Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?