Rex Venture Group, LLC v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Rex Venture Group, LLC doing business as ZeekRewards.com
Defendant: Keith Thomas
In Re: Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. as assignee of Matthew E. Orso in his capapcity as successor court appointed Reciver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com for Receiver Kenneth D. Bell
Garnishee: First Security Bank, Simmons Bank, Riverwind Bank, Regions Bank and Centennial Bank
Case Number: 2:2021mc00091
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney listed on Answer to Writ of Garnishment #16 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Lauren M. Elenbaas. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (lw)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #7 Writ Issued - Other. by Centennial Bank. (mjm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #10 Writ Issued - Other. by Riverwind Bank. (mjm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #4 Application for Writ of Garnishment. by Regions Bank. (mjm)
October 23, 2021 Filing 13 Answer by Simmons Bank re #11 Writ Issued - Other Answer to Writ of Garnishment by Simmons Bank. (Mouser, Rosalind) Modified on 10/27/2021 to edit filer and docket text (mjm).
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. re #8 Writ Issued - Other . (Bell, Lindsey)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED. Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Simmons Bank. (src) Modified access on 10/8/2021 (src).
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED. Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Riverwind Bank. (src) Modified acces on 10/8/2021 (src).
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED. Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Regions Bank. (src) Modified access on 10/8/2021 (src).
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED. Writ of Garnishment Issued as to First Security Bank. (src) Modified access on 10/8/2021 (src).
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED. Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Centennial Bank. (src) Modified access on 10/8/2021 (src).
October 8, 2021 Miscellaneous Case filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee, : $ 49, receipt number AARWDC-2473425.. (Newark, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. against Simmons Bank. (Newark, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. against Riverwind Bank. (Newark, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. against Regions Bank. (Newark, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. against First Security Bank. (Newark, Robert)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. against Centennial Bank. (Newark, Robert)
October 6, 2021 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE due to technical difficulties. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 49.00 within 2 business days.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/8/2021 (src) (src)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 CERTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT, filed by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. against Keith Thomas (cnn)
October 1, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Miscellaneous Case. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 49.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/4/2021 (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rex Venture Group, LLC v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. as assignee of Matthew E. Orso in his capapcity as successor court appointed Reciver for Rex Venture Group, LLC d/b/a ZeekRewards.com for Receiver Kenneth D. Bell
Represented By: Robert Clarence Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Venture Group, LLC doing business as ZeekRewards.com
Represented By: Rosalind M. Mouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: First Security Bank
Represented By: Lindsey K. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Simmons Bank
Represented By: Rosalind M. Mouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Riverwind Bank
Represented By: Casey L. Cullipher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Regions Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Centennial Bank
Represented By: Frank E Shaw
Represented By: Lauren M. Elenbaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?