Davis v. Thurston
Plaintiff: Wesley C. Davis
Defendant: John Thurston
Case Number: 2:2022cv02005
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Supplement #1 Complaint by Wesley C. Davis. (mjm)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by John Thurston. (France, Vincent)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Wesley C. Davis. (mjm)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support by John Thurston. (France, Vincent)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by John Thurston. (France, Vincent)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael A. Mosley withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 7, 2022. (mer)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION of Michael A. Mosley to Withdraw as Attorney by John Thurston. (Mosley, Michael)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Perry France on behalf of John Thurston. (France, Vincent)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 3rd flr (Rm 310) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 1, 2022. (jas)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by John Thurston.(Mosley, Michael)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Mosley on behalf of John Thurston. (Mosley, Michael)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion for reconsideration of the Court's order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 21, 2022. (lw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wesley C. Davis. John Thurston served on 1/13/2022, answer due 2/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt - green card)(lw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Reconsider #5 Order on Motion to Expedite by Wesley C. Davis. (lw) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/18/2022 to add filemark) (lw).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 11, 2022. (lw)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to John Thurston and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (mjm)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite by Wesley C. Davis. (lw)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Wesley C. Davis. (lw)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Thurston ( Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 2024041), filed by Wesley C. Davis.(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thurston
Represented By: Vincent Perry France
Represented By: Michael A. Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?